Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Appodia

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Titular Bishop of Capitolias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1834BornSubiaco, Italy
2 Jun 186026.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 189157.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
13 Feb 189157.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Capitolias
8 Mar 189157.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capitolias
7 Nov 190167.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Appodia
Bishop Pasquale Appodia (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 179
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Jun 2016