Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascal Giamgian

Deceased

Bishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa) (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1850Born
16 Sep 188434.4AppointedBishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia
19 Oct 188434.5Ordained BishopBishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia
1 Oct 188636.5AppointedBishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa) (Armenian), Turkey
19 Jan 191665.7DiedBishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa) (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Pascal Giamgian
Bishop Pascal Giamgian (born , died ) Bishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople
Ordained BishopArmenian, Cathedral, Istanbul

  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 397, and Page 471
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017