Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raphaël Bayan, I.C.P.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1914Born
1 Nov 193723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
12 Dec 195844.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
12 Dec 195844.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Taua
6 Jan 195944.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taua
2 Jul 196046.3SucceededBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
9 Mar 198975.0RetiredBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
21 Sep 199985.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Raphaël Bayan
Bishop Raphaël Bayan I.C.P.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iskanderiya {Alexandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZgarta

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 2
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018