Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mesrob Terzian

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian)

Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1914BornAdana
24 Mar 194025.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 196348.5SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
6 Jul 196348.6ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
6 Jul 196348.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
25 Aug 196348.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
14 Jan 197156.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Mesrob Terzian:
Bishop Mesrob Terzian (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Beirut {Bairut}

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015