Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Nerses Bedros XIX (Boutros) Tarmouni (Taza)

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1940Born
15 Aug 196525.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 198949.5AppointedBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
18 Feb 199050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
7 Oct 199959.7SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
7 Oct 199959.7SelectedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
13 Oct 199959.7ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
13 Oct 199959.7ConfirmedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
25 Jun 201575.4DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Nerses Bedros XIX (Boutros) Tarmouni (Taza)
Patriarch Nerses Bedros XIX (Boutros) Tarmouni (Taza) (born , died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Caire
Ordained BishopArmenian, Cathedral, Le Caire

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,425
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,534
  • d: CB, 25 Jun 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Sep 2021

Quantcast