Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Teyrouz, I.C.P.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris (Armenian), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1941 Born
24 Dec 196524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
27 Sep 200059.3AppointedCurial Bishop of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
27 Sep 200059.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Melitene degli Armeni
25 Mar 200159.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Melitene degli Armeni
2 Feb 201371.7AppointedBishop of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris (Armenian), France
23 Jun 201877.1RetiredBishop of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris (Armenian), France

MicroData Summary for Jean Teyrouz
Bishop Jean Teyrouz I.C.P.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo, Syria
Ordained BishopSaint Sauveur, Church, Bourdj Hamoud

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,931
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 17 Sep 2018

Quantcast