Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Boghos Lévon Zékiyan

Archbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1943 Born
1964²20.1ProfessedMember of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia
21 May 196723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia
1993²49.1IncardinatedPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
21 May 201470.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
21 May 201470.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida degli Armeni
13 Sep 201470.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amida degli Armeni
21 Mar 201571.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
21 Mar 201571.4AppointedArchbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Boghos Lévon Zékiyan (VIAF: 92512461)
Archbishop Boghos Lévon Zékiyan (born ) Archbishop of Istanbul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIstanbul

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Istanbul (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Jun 2014
  • ob/c3: CB, 30 Jun 2014
  • c4: CB, 13 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,284
  • r/ab: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 28 Nov 2017