Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Garabed Amadouni

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of France (Armenian)

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1900BornAnkara
8 Dec 192525.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 196060.4AppointedApostolic Exarch of France (Armenian)
22 Jul 196060.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
18 Dec 196060.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
15 Mar 197171.1ResignedApostolic Exarch of France (Armenian)
14 Jan 198483.9DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of France (Armenian)

MicroData Summary for Garabed Amadouni:
Bishop Garabed Amadouni (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of France

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Jul 2014