Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Couzian, I.C.P.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1874Born
15 May 189824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
1 Oct 191137.5AppointedBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
22 Oct 191137.6Ordained BishopBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt
6 May 193359.1DiedBishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria} (Armenian), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Jean Couzian
Bishop Jean Couzian I.C.P.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Iskanderiya {Alexandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMardin
Ordained BishopSan Nicola da Tolentino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 46
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 77
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,942

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast