Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascal Keklikian

Deceased

Bishop of Adana (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1855Born
14 Apr 188428.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 191155.9AppointedBishop of Adana (Armenian), Turkey
22 Oct 191155.9Ordained BishopBishop of Adana (Armenian), Turkey
7 Jan 191256.1InstalledBishop of Adana (Armenian), Turkey
13 Jun 193478.6DiedBishop of Adana (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Pascal Keklikian
Bishop Pascal Keklikian (born , died ) Bishop of Adana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKutahia
Ordained BishopSan Nicola da Tolentino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • op/ob/i: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 36
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 73
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,942

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast