Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grégoire Bahabaninian

Deceased

Bishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1866Born
15 Aug 188922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
1 Oct 191144.8AppointedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
22 Oct 191144.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
3 Jan 195184.0DiedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Grégoire Bahabaninian
Bishop Grégoire Bahabaninian (born , died ) Bishop of Ancira (Angora)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnkara
Ordained BishopSan Nicola da Tolentino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 54
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 75
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,942

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast