Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Ponen Kubi, C.S.C.

Bishop of Mymensingh, Bangladesh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1956 Born
19 Nov 198630.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
24 Dec 200347.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mymensingh, Bangladesh
24 Dec 200347.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni
13 Feb 200447.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni
15 Jul 200650.0AppointedBishop of Mymensingh, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Paul Ponen Kubi
Bishop Paul Ponen Kubi C.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Mymensingh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDewachala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mymensingh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,532
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast