Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Tudu

Bishop of Dinajpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1967 BornChangura
30 Dec 199932.5Ordained PriestPriest of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
29 Oct 201144.4AppointedBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
27 Jan 201244.6Ordained BishopBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Tudu:
Bishop Sebastian Tudu (born ) Bishop of Dinajpur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dinajpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2011
  • ob: CB, 17 Nov 2011
  • c23: CB, 27 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013