Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim J. Rozario, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chittagong


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1930BornSolepur
6 Jun 196231.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
3 Aug 196837.9AppointedBishop of Chittagong, Bangladesh
17 Nov 196838.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chittagong, Bangladesh
30 Jun 199463.8ResignedBishop of Chittagong, Bangladesh
9 Jun 199665.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Chittagong, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Joachim J. Rozario:
Bishop Joachim J. Rozario C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chittagong

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013