Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Beniamino Socche

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1890Born
20 Jul 191323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
4 Feb 193948.7AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
19 Mar 193948.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
13 Feb 194655.7AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
16 Jan 196574.7DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Beniamino Socche
Bishop Beniamino Socche (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicenza, Diocese of Vicenza

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 9
  • opd: CB, 31 Dec 2014
  • obl/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast