Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino Bergonzini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Faenza-Modigliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1907BornSpilamberto
24 Aug 192922.3Ordained PriestPriest of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
12 Feb 195345.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
12 Feb 195345.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Medeli
19 Mar 195345.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medeli
12 Jan 195749.7AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
5 Jun 197063.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Faenza, Italy
5 Jun 197063.1AppointedBishop of Modigliana, Italy
31 Aug 197669.4SucceededBishop of Faenza, Italy
6 Aug 198275.3RetiredBishop of Faenza, Italy
6 Aug 198275.3RetiredBishop of Modigliana, Italy
16 Jan 198779.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marino Bergonzini:
Bishop Marino Bergonzini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Faenza-Modigliana

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015