Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Evasio Colli

Deceased

Bishop of Parma (-Fontevivo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1883BornLu Monferrato
5 Nov 190522.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 192744.5AppointedBishop of Acireale, Italy
20 Nov 192744.5Ordained BishopBishop of Acireale, Italy
7 May 193249.0AppointedBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
18 Oct 195572.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
14 Mar 197187.8DiedBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy

MicroData Summary for Evasio Colli:
Archbishop Evasio Colli (born , died ) Bishop of Parma (-Fontevivo)

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013