Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Maria Cottafavi

Deceased

Bishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1869Born
19 Sep 189122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy
7 May 192657.2AppointedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
29 Jun 192657.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
7 Apr 193162.1DiedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emilio Maria Cottafavi
Bishop Emilio Maria Cottafavi (born , died ) Bishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGazzata

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 41
  • op/c1: CB, 31 Dec 2014
  • op/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast