Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Fabbrucci

Deceased

Bishop of Fidenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1861BornCancelli
19 Aug 188524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Fiesole, Italy
6 Aug 191554.2AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
19 Sep 191554.3Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
9 Aug 193069.2DiedBishop of Fidenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Fabbrucci:
Bishop Giuseppe Fabbrucci (born , died ) Bishop of Fidenza

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1915, Number 57
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013