Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Falcini

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1848BornPrato
1874¹25.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 190759.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
4 Aug 190759.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
2 Sep 190759.4AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
13 Jan 192879.8DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Falcini:
Bishop Carlo Falcini (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 66
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1907, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013