Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Camilli

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1847BornGhivizzano
14 Aug 187023.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Dec 187023.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 188942.0AppointedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
17 Feb 188942.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
16 Jan 189346.0AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
13 Feb 190962.0DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for David Camilli:
Bishop David Camilli (born , died ) Bishop of Fiesole

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 113, and Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015