Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Boracchia

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1849Born
25 May 187222.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 189242.8AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
21 Aug 189242.9Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
24 Apr 192474.5DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Boracchia
Bishop Giovanni Battista Boracchia (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Marittima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Croce di Beverino, Diocese of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sarzana, Diocese of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 371
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017