Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulisse Carlo Bascherini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1844BornCorváia
17 Aug 190763.4AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
29 Sep 190763.5Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
8 Mar 192075.9RetiredBishop of Grosseto, Italy
8 Mar 192075.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
16 May 193389.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ulisse Carlo Bascherini:
Bishop Ulisse Carlo Bascherini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 50, and Page 189
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013