Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Maffi

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1858BornCorteolona
16 Apr 188122.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 190243.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ravenna, Italy
9 Jun 190243.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
11 Jun 190243.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
22 Jun 190344.7AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
15 Apr 190748.5Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190748.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
17 Mar 193172.4DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Maffi:
Cardinal Pietro Maffi (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
  • a cardinal for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 167, and Page 456
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013