Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Fanucchi

Deceased

Bishop of Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1846Born
24 Aug 190760.8AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
8 Sep 190760.8Ordained BishopBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
23 Jul 191063.7DiedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Fanucchi
Bishop Domenico Fanucchi (born , died ) Bishop of Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorcari

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast