Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Achille Razz˛li, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1863Born
9 Aug 188522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Aug 191350.5AppointedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
28 Sep 191350.6Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
27 Apr 192562.2DiedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Achille Razz˛li
Bishop Roberto Achille Razz˛li O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafranca di Lunigiana

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1913, Number 55
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast