Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Donato Velluti Zati di San Clemente

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pescia, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1845Born
21 Dec 186722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 May 186923.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188337.4AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
1 Apr 188337.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
11 Mar 1885³39.4ResignedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
27 Mar 188539.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus
24 Mar 189852.4AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
15 Apr 190761.5ResignedBishop of Pescia, Italy
15 Apr 190761.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
11 Dec 192782.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Pescia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Donato Velluti Zati di San Clemente
Archbishop Donato Velluti Zati di San Clemente (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSte Madeleine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 428, and Page 456
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 457
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017