Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelico Antonio Zannetti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1864Born
12 Mar 188722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Dec 191652.2AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
22 Apr 191752.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
24 Apr 192661.6DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelico Antonio Zannetti (VIAF: 198942847)
Bishop Angelico Antonio Zannetti O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Bosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Piero di Bagno

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,917, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast