Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Manicardi

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1825Born
26 Dec 184722.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Sep 187954.6AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
28 Sep 187954.6Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
1 Feb 188054.9InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
7 Jun 188661.3AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
20 Oct 190176.6DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Manicardi (VIAF: 90236506)
Bishop Vincenzo Manicardi (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRubiera
Ordained BishopS. Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 163
  • c34: CB, 31 Dec 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017