Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Giustiniani

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1835Born
18 Sep 185823.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 188651.2AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
13 Jun 188651.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
2 Jul 191782.2DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Giustiniani (VIAF: 89494439)
Archbishop Giuseppe Giustiniani (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 530
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017