Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giordano Corsini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guastalla

Titular Bishop of Arca in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1871BornSan Michele-Extra
7 Mar 192250.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Verona, Italy
7 Mar 192250.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
2 Apr 192250.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
25 May 192352.0AppointedBishop of Guastalla, Italy
3 Oct 192352.4InstalledBishop of Guastalla, Italy
7 Jul 193261.2ResignedBishop of Guastalla, Italy
7 Jul 193261.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Armenia
14 Apr 193361.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Guastalla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giordano Corsini:
Bishop Giordano Corsini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guastalla

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013