Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Stephen Dehler, C. R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bermuda Islands

Titular Bishop of Clazomenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1889BornSt. Agatha, Canada
19 Dec 191626.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
7 May 195464.3AppointedPrefect of Bermuda Islands, Antilles
28 Jan 195666.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Clazomenae
28 Jan 195666.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bermuda Islands, Antilles
19 Mar 195666.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clazomenae
26 Aug 196676.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Bermuda Islands, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Robert Stephen Dehler:
Bishop Robert Stephen Dehler C. R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bermuda Islands

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015