Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas Sears

Deceased

Prefect of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1824Born
Oct 185531.7Ordained PriestPriest of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada
17 Sep 187147.7AppointedPrefect of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s), Canada
7 Nov 188561.8DiedPrefect of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s), Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas Sears:
Thomas Sears (born 1824, died ) Prefect of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s)

  • a priest for 30.0 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015