Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sylvain Lavoie, O.M.I.

Archbishop Emeritus of Keewatin-Le Pas, Manitoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1947 BornDelmas
17 Feb 197426.8ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Oct 197427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 Jul 200558.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Keewatin-Le Pas, Manitoba, Canada
29 Aug 200558.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Keewatin-Le Pas, Manitoba, Canada
25 Mar 200658.9SucceededArchbishop of Keewatin-Le Pas, Manitoba, Canada
16 Jul 201265.2RetiredArchbishop of Keewatin-Le Pas, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Sylvain Lavoie:
Archbishop Sylvain Lavoie O.M.I. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Keewatin-Le Pas

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Keewatin-Le Pas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2005
  • c2+: CB
  • s: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,968

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013