Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald William Wiesner, O.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Prince George, British Columbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1937 BornDenzil
23 Feb 196325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
6 Oct 199255.3AppointedBishop of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada
22 Feb 199355.7Ordained BishopBishop of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada
3 Jan 201375.5RetiredBishop of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gerald William Wiesner:
Bishop Gerald William Wiesner O.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Prince George

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Prince George.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 12,003
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013