Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marius Paré

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chicoutimi, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1903BornMontmagny
3 Jul 192724.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 195652.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
7 Feb 195652.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aegae
1 May 195652.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aegae
6 Feb 196056.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
18 Feb 196157.7SucceededBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
5 Apr 197975.9ResignedBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
16 Feb 200298.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Marius Paré:
Bishop Marius Paré (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chicoutimi

  • a priest for 74.6 years
  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 33
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013