Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Léon Pelletier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1904Born
24 Jun 193126.8Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 194238.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
5 Dec 194238.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
24 Feb 194338.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
26 Jul 194742.9AppointedBishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
30 Oct 197571.1ResignedBishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
24 Sep 198783.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Georges Léon Pelletier
Bishop Georges Léon Pelletier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trois-Rivières

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Épiphane (Rivière-du-Loup)

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,943, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast