Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albini Lafortune

Deceased

Bishop of Nicolet, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1893BornSaint-Paul-l'Ermite
15 Apr 191723.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 193845.0AppointedBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
25 Jul 193845.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
8 Nov 195057.5DiedBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Albini Lafortune:
Bishop Albini Lafortune (born , died ) Bishop of Nicolet

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013