Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Albertus Martin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicolet, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1913Born
18 May 193925.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 195036.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
21 Aug 195036.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bassiana
7 Oct 195037.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bassiana
8 Nov 195037.0SucceededBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
14 Mar 198975.4RetiredBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
16 Dec 199077.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicolet, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Albertus Martin (VIAF: 105077208)
Bishop Joseph Albertus Martin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicolet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSouthbridge, MA, USA

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast