Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges-Arthur Melançon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chicoutimi, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1886BornSaint-Guillaume d’Upton
12 Sep 190923.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 194054.1AppointedBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
23 Jul 194054.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
18 Feb 196174.9RetiredBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
18 Feb 196174.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Esbus
22 Nov 197084.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Esbus
22 Nov 197084.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
21 Oct 198296.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Georges-Arthur Melançon:
Archbishop Georges-Arthur Melançon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chicoutimi

  • a priest for 73.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013