Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis Jobidon, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mzuzu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1916BornChâteau-Richer, Canada
19 Jun 194326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
3 Jan 195841.1AppointedPrefect of Northern Nyassa, Malawi
17 Jan 196144.2AppointedBishop of Mzuzu, Malawi
22 May 196144.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mzuzu, Malawi
1 Oct 198770.9ResignedBishop of Mzuzu, Malawi
14 Apr 199780.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Mzuzu, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Jobidon:
Bishop Jean-Louis Jobidon M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mzuzu

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013