Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Patrick Mahoney

Deceased

Bishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1927Born
7 Jun 195224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
20 Sep 196739.7AppointedBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
13 Dec 196740.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
2 Mar 199567.2DiedBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Patrick Mahoney
Bishop James Patrick Mahoney (born , died ) Bishop of Saskatoon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaskatoon

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast