Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Peter Wilfred Novecosky, O.S.B.

Abbot Emeritus of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1945 Born
11 Jul 197025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Jul 199045.2SelectedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
19 Oct 199045.5ConfirmedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
14 Sep 199853.4ResignedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Peter Wilfred Novecosky:
Abbot Peter Wilfred Novecosky O.S.B. (born ) Abbot Emeritus of Saint Peter-Muenster

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Saint Peter-Muenster.

  • a priest for years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013