Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas Cardinal Weld

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1773Born
3 Apr 182148.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 182653.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
23 May 182653.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
6 Aug 182653.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
13 Mar 183057.1ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
15 Mar 183057.1Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jul 183057.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
10 Apr 183764.2DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas Weld (VIAF: 24103923)
Thomas Cardinal Weld (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Kingston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopS. Edmund College, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 16.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
  • a cardinal for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 72, and Page 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 26
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1830
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Sep 2021

Quantcast