Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John O’Brien

Deceased

Bishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1832Born
6 Apr 185624.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 187542.9AppointedBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
18 Apr 187543.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
1 Aug 187947.4DiedBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for John O’Brien
Bishop John O’Brien (born , died ) Bishop of Kingston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoughborough
Ordained BishopKingston, Diocese of Kingston, Ontario

  • a priest for 23.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 479
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1875, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017