Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Francis Crinnon

Deceased

Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1820¹BornCullen, Ireland
23 Sep 185434.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 187454.1AppointedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
19 Apr 187454.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
25 Nov 188262.9DiedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Francis Crinnon:
Bishop Peter Francis Crinnon (died ) Bishop of Hamilton

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013