Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Andrew Macdonell

Deceased

Bishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1853Born
11 Sep 188127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
21 Mar 190652.3AppointedBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
24 Jun 190652.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
10 Nov 192066.9DiedBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for William Andrew Macdonell
Bishop William Andrew Macdonell (born , died ) Bishop of Alexandria in Ontario

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSouth Branch, Rivière-aux-Raisins

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 45
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018