Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Power

Deceased

Bishop of Toronto, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1804BornHalifax
17 Aug 182722.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 184137.1AppointedBishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
8 May 184237.5Ordained BishopBishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
1 Oct 184742.9DiedBishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Power (VIAF: 65155858)
Bishop Michael Power (born , died ) Bishop of Toronto

  • a priest for 20.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 373
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016