Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Donald McDonald

Deceased

Bishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1797BornSaint Andrew's
1 Jun 182325.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 183739.2AppointedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
15 Oct 183739.8Ordained BishopBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
30 Dec 185962.0DiedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada

MicroData Summary for Bernard Donald McDonald:
Bishop Bernard Donald McDonald (born , died ) Bishop of Charlottetown

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013