Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Arthur Jensen

Bishop of Prince George, British Columbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1954 BornNorth Vancouver
24 May 198026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
3 Jan 201358.6AppointedBishop of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada
2 Apr 201358.8Ordained BishopBishop of Prince George, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Stephen Arthur Jensen:
Bishop Stephen Arthur Jensen (born ) Bishop of Prince George

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Prince George.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2013
  • ob: CB, 31 Jan 2013
  • c34: CB, 18 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,667

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013